+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor