+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/15/2021
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/10/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor