+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 1/1/20
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Passed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/16/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed