+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (77)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees with instructions
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken in committee
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor