+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor