+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
- Read first time
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor