+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed