+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Miller, Rick
Type:
Primary Sponsor