+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor