+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed