+ − Actions (47)
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor