+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor