+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/22/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On November 23, 2020 in the House:
- Filed