+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Left pending in committee
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor