+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Passed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor