+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/24/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On November 23, 2020 in the House:
- Filed