+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor