+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor