+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor