+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor