+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed