+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (37)
Turner, Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor