+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (94)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Postponed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Amendment withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Three day rule suspended
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor