+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed