+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
- Read first time
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed