+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed