+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor