+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On December 12, 2016 in the House:
- Filed