+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed