+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On May 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Record vote
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/8/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On November 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor