+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On November 12, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor