+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor