+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/24/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/5/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor