+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/25/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor