+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor