+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor