+ − Actions (96)
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (92)
Type:
Primary Sponsor