+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (69)
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor