+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor