+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Health & Human Services
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Hernandez Luna
Type:
Primary Sponsor