+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (201)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Motion to suspend rules
- Motion withdrawn
- Rules suspended
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
- Point of order overruled
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Motion to table
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion withdrawn
- Record vote
- Vote reconsidered
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment as amended withdrawn
- Amendment amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order overruled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Substitute amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Recommitted to committee
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor