+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (74)
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Left pending in committee
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/29/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor