+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to table fails
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (4)
Davis, Sarah
Type:
Primary Sponsor