+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 16, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor