+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/23/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/5/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Filed