+ − Actions (54)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on intent calendar
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
- Passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Rules suspended
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor