+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed