+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Turner, Sylvester
Type:
Primary Sponsor