+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On December 22, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor