+ − Actions (30)
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor